THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:17:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Middle Road
CTMH Doctors Hospital
George Town George Town KY1-1104
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3453259000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 515-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 905848001
Extension: 4
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500-89 Queensway W
iScope Concussion and Pain Clinics
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 14169007007
Fax: 14169007006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Joseph Punambolam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Nov 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 16 Middle Road
CTMH Doctors Hospital
George Town George Town KY1-1104
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3453259000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 515-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 905848001
Extension: 4
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500-89 Queensway W
iScope Concussion and Pain Clinics
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: 14169007007
Fax: 14169007006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ryan Joseph Punambolam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Nov 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN JOSEPH PUNAMBOLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNAMBOLAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RYAN JOSEPH PUNAMBOLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUNAMBOLAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2020