THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:28:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 40
Calabogie Medical Centre
1101 Francis Street
Calabogie ON K0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 752-2323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 40
Calabogie Medical Centre
1101 Francis Street
Calabogie ON K0J 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 752-2323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELLEN PENNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH ELLEN PENNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2020