THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:20:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Szeged, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Anatomical Pathology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 426-813-5967
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Szeged, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Anatomical Pathology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 426-813-5967
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 01 Dec 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Dec 2021
30 Nov 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 01 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 30 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANITA NAGY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Laboratory Medicine and Pathobiology, Division of Medicine at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. NAGY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NAGY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NAGY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NAGY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 November, 2028.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ANITA NAGY may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Laboratory Medicine and Pathobiology, Division of Medicine at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. NAGY holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. NAGY no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. NAGY’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. NAGY’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 December, 2021. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 November, 2028.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Szeged, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Nov 2028

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2020