THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology & Hematology (DMOH) - OPG Building 700 U
6th Floor, Room 702
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-4501
Extension: 5375
Fax: 416-946-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Ave
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Medical Oncology & Hematology (DMOH) - OPG Building 700 U
6th Floor, Room 702
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-4501
Extension: 5375
Fax: 416-946-4407

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 04 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUILLAUME RICHARD-CARPENTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARD-CARPENTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUILLAUME RICHARD-CARPENTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHARD-CARPENTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2020