THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:20:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE LAFLAMME shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LAFLAMME is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. LAFLAMME shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LAFLAMME is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LAFLAMME shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LAFLAMME is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LAFLAMME no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE LAFLAMME shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LAFLAMME is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. LAFLAMME shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LAFLAMME is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LAFLAMME shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LAFLAMME is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LAFLAMME no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
EL - Forensic Pathology
01 Jun 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Forensic Pathology
DATE: 01 Jun 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020