THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:01:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2018
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Cardiology
24 Oct 2022 to 20 Nov 2022
University of Ottawa
EL - Cardiology
04 May 2020 to 31 May 2020
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 24 Oct 2022 to 20 Nov 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 04 May 2020 to 31 May 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 2020