THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 409 - 1371 Neilson Rd
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network – Centenary Hospital
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network - General hospital
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 23 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Democratic Rep of Congo
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, KACHCHI, URDU
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 409 - 1371 Neilson Rd
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network – Centenary Hospital
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Network - General hospital
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 23 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Democratic Rep of Congo
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Aug 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 26 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NURIN JIVANI may practise medicine independently in pediatric cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NURIN JIVANI may practise medicine independently in pediatric cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Feb 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2020