THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc.
5-1310 Don Mills Rd
North York Ontario M3B 2W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc.
236 Avenue Rd
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalgliesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc.
5-1310 Don Mills Rd
North York Ontario M3B 2W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: KMH Cardiology Centres Inc.
236 Avenue Rd
Toronto Ontario M5R 2J4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalgliesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 May 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Dec 2021
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 15 2021
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JULIAN LIND DALGLIESH may practise medicine independently in outpatient-based internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JULIAN LIND DALGLIESH may practise medicine independently in outpatient-based internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020