THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:42:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre
For Integrated Health and Wellness
20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jahangir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Mar 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Leicester, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peel Memorial Centre
For Integrated Health and Wellness
20 Lynch St
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jahangir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Mar 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHURRAM JAHANGIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHANGIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHURRAM JAHANGIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAHANGIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2020