THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:09:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahrain

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahrain

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED ABDULJABBAR MOHAMED HADI ALABBASI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALABBASI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALABBASI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALABBASI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALABBASI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALABBASI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALABBASI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AHMED ABDULJABBAR MOHAMED HADI ALABBASI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALABBASI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. ALABBASI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALABBASI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. ALABBASI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALABBASI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALABBASI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: RCSI - Medical University of Bahrain, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jun 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
06 Apr 2020 to 31 May 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jun 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
DATE: 06 Apr 2020 to 31 May 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020