THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:07:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
30 Bond St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAVA EVA-ELANA STARKMAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. STARKMAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STARKMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STARKMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STARKMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. STARKMAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. STARKMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAVA EVA-ELANA STARKMAN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. STARKMAN is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. STARKMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. STARKMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. STARKMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. STARKMAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. STARKMAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
02 Feb 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Feb 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
18 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
28 Jul 2024 to 17 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 27 Jul 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 02 Feb 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 01 Feb 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 18 Jun 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 28 Jul 2024 to 17 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 27 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020