THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:15:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELSA CELESTE DINSDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINSDALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELSA CELESTE DINSDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DINSDALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jan 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020