THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:04:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501-67 Yonge St
LiveActive Sport Medicine
Toronto ON M5E 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Department of Surgery
Division of Surgical Assisting
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Department of Surgery
Division of Surgical Assisting
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 481 Danforth Ave
Push Pounds Sports Medicine
Toronto ON M4K 1P5
Phone: (416) 888-1008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Far Eastern University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501-67 Yonge St
LiveActive Sport Medicine
Toronto ON M5E 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Department of Surgery
Division of Surgical Assisting
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health
Department of Surgery
Division of Surgical Assisting
Oshawa Ontario L1G 8A1
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 481 Danforth Ave
Push Pounds Sports Medicine
Toronto ON M4K 1P5
Phone: (416) 888-1008
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAITH SHARON TABIJE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABIJE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAITH SHARON TABIJE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TABIJE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Far Eastern University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020