THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 02:59:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delia Dragomir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dragomir (CPSO#: 120837 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
7055237100 Extn: 1050

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Delia Dragomir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dragomir (CPSO#: 120837 )
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Emergency Department
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
7055237100 Extn: 1050

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELIA DRAGOMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAGOMIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DELIA DRAGOMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAGOMIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020