THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:50:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
76 Stuart St
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA MARIE SCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020