Medical School:
National University of Ireland, 2019
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology |
12 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 11 Aug 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
University of Toronto |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology |
03 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021 |
University of Toronto |
AVP - Anesthesiology |
01 Jul 2020 to 02 Nov 2020 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
12 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 11 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
DATE:
03 Nov 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Anesthesiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2020 to 02 Nov 2020
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto