THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:01:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Calicut University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-30 West Beaver Creek Rd
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-877-718-2196
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pokkakkillath Abdul Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Calicut University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-30 West Beaver Creek Rd
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 1-877-718-2196
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Montpelier St
Brampton ON L6Y 6H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pokkakkillath Abdul Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ASHIF POKKAKKILLATH ABDUL MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POKKAKKILLATH ABDUL MAJEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ASHIF POKKAKKILLATH ABDUL MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POKKAKKILLATH ABDUL MAJEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Calicut University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2020
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2020