THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:21:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Infinity Health Centre
39 Lower Simcoe St
Toronto Ontario M5J 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-504-0628
Fax: 416-504-2009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Infinity Health Centre
39 Lower Simcoe St
Toronto Ontario M5J 3A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-504-0628
Fax: 416-504-2009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Aug 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BAIRD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIRD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 May 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 May 2020