THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 22:55:24 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Napier Street
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 120 Napier Street
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
Goderich Ontario N7A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Nov 2024
21 Nov 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 22 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 21 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PETER DANIEL DIXON may practise psychiatry with Alexandra Marine and General Hospital in Goderich, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DIXON’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. DIXON’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. DIXON’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 November, 2024, and will expire on or before 21 November, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. PETER DANIEL DIXON may practise psychiatry with Alexandra Marine and General Hospital in Goderich, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DIXON’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. DIXON’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. DIXON’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 November, 2024, and will expire on or before 21 November, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jul 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 21 Nov 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2020