THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:35:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERCEDES ANGELA LUPO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LUPO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LUPO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LUPO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LUPO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LUPO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LUPO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MERCEDES ANGELA LUPO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LUPO is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. LUPO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LUPO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LUPO shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LUPO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LUPO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
AVP - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020