Medical School:
Ross University School of Medicine, 2017
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
McMaster University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery |
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021 |
McMaster University |
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery |
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020 |
McMaster University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University
SPECIALTY:
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE:
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY:
McMaster University