THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:35:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132580100
Fax: 6132586171
Address: 420 Cooper St
Centretown Community Health Centre
Ottawa ON K2P 2N6
Phone: 613-233-4697
Fax: 613-233-4541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132580100
Fax: 6132586171
Address: 420 Cooper St
Centretown Community Health Centre
Ottawa ON K2P 2N6
Phone: 613-233-4697
Fax: 613-233-4541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HATEF MOTTAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTAGHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HATEF MOTTAGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTTAGHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020