THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:37:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: (365) 523-2605
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
General Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
General Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: (365) 523-2605
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
General Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
General Internal Medicine
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGAR GHAZARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZARIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAGAR GHAZARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHAZARIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020