THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165964200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 University Avenue
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165964200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HADI TOHIDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TOHIDI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. TOHIDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TOHIDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TOHIDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TOHIDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TOHIDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 17 April, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HADI TOHIDI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TOHIDI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. TOHIDI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TOHIDI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. TOHIDI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TOHIDI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TOHIDI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 17 April, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2025 to 17 Apr 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
18 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 17 Apr 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
University of Toronto
AVP - Internal Medicine
01 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
AVP - Internal Medicine
10 Apr 2023 to 30 Apr 2023
University of Toronto
AVP - Internal Medicine
16 Jan 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 17 Apr 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 18 Apr 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 17 Apr 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 16 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 15 Jan 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 May 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE: 10 Apr 2023 to 30 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE: 16 Jan 2023 to 09 Apr 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 17 Apr 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 17 Apr 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020