THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:37:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 753 Sour Springs Rd
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Phone: (519) 753-9581
Extension: 3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 347 Colborne St
Brantford ON N3S 3N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 753 Sour Springs Rd
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Phone: (519) 753-9581
Extension: 3232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN JOAN STOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN JOAN STOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 20 Sep 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020