THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:06:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cambridge St N
Saint-Vincent Hospital
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7785809283
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cambridge St N
Saint-Vincent Hospital
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7785809283
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIYOUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIYOUNG LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020