THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:32:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare, Charlton Campus
General Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 4167327306
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of General Surgery
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare, Charlton Campus
General Surgery
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 4167327306
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUNG LEE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEE is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUNG LEE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. LEE is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. LEE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. LEE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. LEE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. LEE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. LEE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020