THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:41:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Lower Jarvis Street
Queens Quay Family Health Team
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 6478279200
Fax: 6478279202
Address: 3 Charles Street West
Health Clinic by Shopper's
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1R4
Phone: (416) 926-2740
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Lower Jarvis Street
Queens Quay Family Health Team
Toronto Ontario M5E 1Z2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 6478279200
Fax: 6478279202
Address: 3 Charles Street West
Health Clinic by Shopper's
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1R4
Phone: (416) 926-2740
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA NICOLE HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA NICOLE HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Oct 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020