THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:49:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA ROSETTA HATFIELD KAY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KAY is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. KAY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KAY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KAY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KAY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KAY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANESSA ROSETTA HATFIELD KAY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KAY is enrolled at McMaster University;
(2) Dr. KAY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KAY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. KAY shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KAY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KAY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
16 Feb 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2025 to 15 Feb 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
16 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 15 Feb 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
25 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2023 to 24 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 16 Feb 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 15 Feb 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 16 Feb 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 15 Feb 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 25 Jun 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 24 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020