THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:46:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: Hooker, Jodie Joy (Used Until: 15 Sep 2022)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Victoria Avenue
South East Grey Community Health Centre
PO Box 360
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-986-2222
Fax: 519-986-3999
Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

General Information

Former Name: Hooker, Jodie Joy (Used Until: 15 Sep 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Victoria Avenue
South East Grey Community Health Centre
PO Box 360
Markdale Ontario N0C 1H0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-986-2222
Fax: 519-986-3999
Address: 459 Hume Street
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Phone: 7054452550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODIE JOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODIE JOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020