THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:31:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital - Hamilton Health Sciences
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y3
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1200 Main Street West
McMaster Children's Hospital - Hamilton Health Sciences
Substance Use Service
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2A5
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout Meno Ya Win Health Centre
Sioux Lookout Ontario P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737-3030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEANOR HILARY ALTHEA VANDERMEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERMEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELEANOR HILARY ALTHEA VANDERMEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDERMEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jan 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020