THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:34:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053369633
Fax: 9056345332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053369633
Fax: 9056345332

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURJOT SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURJOT SINGH GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020