THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:17:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6860
Fax: 416-530-6160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6860
Fax: 416-530-6160

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE JENNIFER BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIANE JENNIFER BAILEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAILEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020