THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:47:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Toronto St
Unity Health Toronto - St. Michael's Hospital
Occupational Medicine Clinic
Suite 700, 7th Floor
Toronto ON M5C 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5074
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1280 Main Street West
McMaster University Medical Centre
Clinical Immunology & Allergy
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 36 Toronto St
Unity Health Toronto - St. Michael's Hospital
Occupational Medicine Clinic
Suite 700, 7th Floor
Toronto ON M5C 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-864-5074
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1280 Main Street West
McMaster University Medical Centre
Clinical Immunology & Allergy
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4L8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Feb 2025
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 07 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. FELIX LING-FUNG CHAN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAN is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. CHAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. CHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. CHAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. CHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. CHAN may practise:

(a) Internal Medicine and to the extent of their employment at North York General Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College

(b) Adult Critical Care and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(c) Adult Critical Care and to the extent of their employment at St. Joseph's Health Care System-Hamilton, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) Internal Medicine and to the extent of their employment at McMaster University Medical Centre Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. CHAN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. CHAN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. CHAN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. CHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. CHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. CHAN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. CHAN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. CHAN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. CHAN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. CHAN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. CHAN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. CHAN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. CHAN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. FELIX LING-FUNG CHAN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. CHAN is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. CHAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. CHAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. CHAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. CHAN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. CHAN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. CHAN may practise:

(a) Internal Medicine and to the extent of their employment at North York General Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College

(b) Adult Critical Care and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College;

(c) Adult Critical Care and to the extent of their employment at St. Joseph's Health Care System-Hamilton, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) Internal Medicine and to the extent of their employment at McMaster University Medical Centre Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. CHAN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. CHAN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. CHAN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. CHAN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. CHAN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. CHAN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. CHAN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. CHAN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. CHAN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. CHAN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. CHAN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. CHAN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. CHAN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine
12 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 11 Feb 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
12 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 11 Feb 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
12 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 11 Feb 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine
DATE: 12 Feb 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 11 Feb 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 12 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 11 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 12 Feb 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 11 Feb 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020