THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:34:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRETT GRATTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRATTAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRETT GRATTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRATTAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020