THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:35:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The University of Toronto
Division of Plastic Surgery
The Rotman/Stewart Building
149 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 1P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The University of Toronto
Division of Plastic Surgery
The Rotman/Stewart Building
149 College St
Toronto Ontario M5T 1P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL ROSE VALIQUETTE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VALIQUETTE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VALIQUETTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VALIQUETTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VALIQUETTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VALIQUETTE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VALIQUETTE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHANTAL ROSE VALIQUETTE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VALIQUETTE is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. VALIQUETTE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VALIQUETTE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. VALIQUETTE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VALIQUETTE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VALIQUETTE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020