THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 Saint Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1365 Richmond Road
Ottawa Ontario K2B 6X6
Phone: (613) 820-4922
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 Saint Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1365 Richmond Road
Ottawa Ontario K2B 6X6
Phone: (613) 820-4922
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2420
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARISSA LAI SA UKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UKOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARISSA LAI SA UKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UKOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020