THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:28:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2175 Richmond Street
Uptown Medical Clinic
London Ontario N6G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-7117
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Station St
Queen's Family Health Team
Belleville ON K8N 2S9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2175 Richmond Street
Uptown Medical Clinic
London Ontario N6G 3V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-850-7117
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 145 Station St
Queen's Family Health Team
Belleville ON K8N 2S9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XUAN XIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XUAN XIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020