THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 02:59:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1380 Upper Canada Street
Brightside Medical Clinic
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K2T 0N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-599-5000
Fax: 343-599-5001
Address: 80 McGonigal St W
Renfrew County Virtual Triage/Assessment Centre
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Phone: 1-844-727-6404
Fax: 343-761-2921
Address: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa ON K8H 3H5
Phone: 613-687-7641
Fax: 613-687-6808
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Phone: 613-432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1380 Upper Canada Street
Brightside Medical Clinic
Suite 205
Ottawa Ontario K2T 0N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-599-5000
Fax: 343-599-5001
Address: 80 McGonigal St W
Renfrew County Virtual Triage/Assessment Centre
Arnprior ON K7S 1M3
Phone: 1-844-727-6404
Fax: 343-761-2921
Address: 154 Civic Centre Rd
Petawawa ON K8H 3H5
Phone: 613-687-7641
Fax: 613-687-6808
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
Renfrew ON K7V 1P6
Phone: 613-432-4851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jul 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN JAY RICHARD MORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN JAY RICHARD MORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020