THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:53:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Chowsunket Street
Fraser Lake Community Health Centre
Fraser Lake British Columbia V0J 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (250) 699-6225
Fax: 250-699-6987
Address: 2510 Highway 62
Wrinch Memorial Hospital Doctors Clinic
Hazelton British Columbia V0J 1Y1
Phone: 250-842-5234
Fax: 250-842-5065
Address: 15 Meredith Street East
Northeastern Manitoulin Family Health Team
c/o Little Current Medical Associates
PO Box 979
Little Current Ontario P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-2450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 130 Chowsunket Street
Fraser Lake Community Health Centre
Fraser Lake British Columbia V0J 1S0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (250) 699-6225
Fax: 250-699-6987
Address: 2510 Highway 62
Wrinch Memorial Hospital Doctors Clinic
Hazelton British Columbia V0J 1Y1
Phone: 250-842-5234
Fax: 250-842-5065
Address: 15 Meredith Street East
Northeastern Manitoulin Family Health Team
c/o Little Current Medical Associates
PO Box 979
Little Current Ontario P0P 1K0
Phone: (705) 368-2450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jul 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 22 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MARY ANN COMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA MARY ANN COMEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020