THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:12:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 May 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 21 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. FRANK BATTAGLIA shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BATTAGLIA is enrolled at the McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BATTAGLIA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BATTAGLIA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BATTAGLIA shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. BATTAGLIA may practise:

(a) critical care medicine and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) trauma medicine and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(c) emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at St. Joseph's Health Care System, Hamilton, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital Burlington, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. BATTAGLIA may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. BATTAGLIA must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. BATTAGLIA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. BATTAGLIA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. BATTAGLIA must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. BATTAGLIA to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. BATTAGLIA’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. BATTAGLIA takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. BATTAGLIA may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. BATTAGLIA applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. FRANK BATTAGLIA shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BATTAGLIA is enrolled at the McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BATTAGLIA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BATTAGLIA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BATTAGLIA shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. BATTAGLIA may practise:

(a) critical care medicine and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) trauma medicine and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(c) emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at St. Joseph's Health Care System, Hamilton, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) emergency medicine and to the extent of their employment at Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital Burlington, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. BATTAGLIA may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. BATTAGLIA must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. BATTAGLIA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. BATTAGLIA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. BATTAGLIA must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BATTAGLIA’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. BATTAGLIA to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. BATTAGLIA’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. BATTAGLIA takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. BATTAGLIA may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. BATTAGLIA applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020