THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:49:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
30 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
University of Ottawa
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
08 Apr 2024 to 02 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 30 Jul 2024 to 26 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 08 Apr 2024 to 02 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020