THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:34:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 745 Montréal Road
Équipe de santé familiale académique Montfort
Suite 101 B
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-749-4429
Fax: 613-749-7942
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Hôpital Montfort
Médecine familiale
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 745 Montréal Road
Équipe de santé familiale académique Montfort
Suite 101 B
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-749-4429
Fax: 613-749-7942
Address: 713 Montréal Road
Hôpital Montfort
Médecine familiale
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Aug 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLOTTE ROY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Aug 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020