THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:33:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Hospital Medicine
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM DAVID MONOD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MONOD is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. MONOD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MONOD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MONOD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MONOD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MONOD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM DAVID MONOD shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. MONOD is enrolled at University of Ottawa;
(2) Dr. MONOD shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. MONOD is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. MONOD shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. MONOD is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. MONOD no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020