THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Obstetrics & Gynecology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 85044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Obstetrics & Gynecology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Extension: 85044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 May 2024
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. YANNAY KHAIKIN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAIKIN is enrolled at the University of Toronto.

(2) In Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. KHAIKIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAIKIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. KHAIKIN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. KHAIKIN may practise:

(a) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at Mount Sinai Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(c) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at Toronto East General Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at St. Michael’s Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. KHAIKIN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. KHAIKIN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. KHAIKIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. KHAIKIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. KHAIKIN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. KHAIKIN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. KHAIKIN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. KHAIKIN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. KHAIKIN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. KHAIKIN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. YANNAY KHAIKIN shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KHAIKIN is enrolled at the University of Toronto.

(2) In Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. KHAIKIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHAIKIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. KHAIKIN shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. KHAIKIN may practise:

(a) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at Mount Sinai Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(b) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(c) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at Toronto East General Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(d) Medicine providing ward coverage and to the extent of his employment at St. Michael’s Hospital, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. KHAIKIN may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. KHAIKIN must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. KHAIKIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. KHAIKIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. KHAIKIN must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisors identified in paragraph (4) notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. KHAIKIN’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. KHAIKIN to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. KHAIKIN’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. KHAIKIN takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. KHAIKIN may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. KHAIKIN applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator Program
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 May 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 May 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020