THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:09:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton Street
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Phone: 9059857321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart Street
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton Street
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
Port Perry Ontario L9L 1L9
Phone: 9059857321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE RITA FALZONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALZONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE RITA FALZONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALZONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020