Medical School:
McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology |
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology |
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology |
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology |
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022 |
Queen's University |
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology |
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021 |
Queen's University |
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
DATE:
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
DATE:
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University
SPECIALTY:
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
DATE:
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY:
Queen's University