THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:24:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Juravinkski Hospital
Section B3 – Rm. 143
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession St
Juravinkski Hospital
Section B3 – Rm. 143
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Oct 2024
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 25 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MEGHAN ELIZABETH BOURQUE shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOURQUE is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. BOURQUE’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BOURQUE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOURQUE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. BOURQUE’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BOURQUE shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. BOURQUE may practise general surgery and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. BOURQUE’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. BOURQUE may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. BOURQUE must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. BOURQUE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. BOURQUE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. BOURQUE must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BOURQUE’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BOURQUE’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. BOURQUE to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. BOURQUE’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. BOURQUE takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. BOURQUE may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. BOURQUE applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(1) Dr. MEGHAN ELIZABETH BOURQUE shall practise medicine as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOURQUE is enrolled at McMaster University.

(2) In Dr. BOURQUE’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BOURQUE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOURQUE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education.

(3) In Dr. BOURQUE’s practice in the postgraduate medical education program, Dr. BOURQUE shall not charge a fee for medical services.

Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(4) Dr. BOURQUE may practise general surgery and to the extent of their employment at Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

(5) In Dr. BOURQUE’s practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. BOURQUE may not charge a fee for medical services.

Expiry of Certificate

(6) This certificate of registration expires, and Dr. BOURQUE must thereupon cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education program, on the earlier of the following times:

(a) when Dr. BOURQUE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education program provided by a medical school in Ontario, or

(b) when Dr. BOURQUE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(7) This certificate automatically converts to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate and Dr. BOURQUE must immediately cease all practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of the following occurs:

(a) the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. BOURQUE’s practice, including but not limited to concerns regarding knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude;

(b) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. BOURQUE’s practice;

(c) the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school’s approval for Dr. BOURQUE to engage in practice outside the postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;

(d) when Dr. BOURQUE’s employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases; or

(e) if Dr. BOURQUE takes a leave of absence, or transfers to another program, from the postgraduate education program specified in paragraph (1).

Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

(8) In the event of conversion to a regular Postgraduate Education certificate under paragraph (7) or expiry of the certificate under paragraph (7), Dr. BOURQUE may not resume any practice outside the postgraduate medical education program under the restricted registration for residents policy until Dr. BOURQUE applies for a new certificate of registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
10 Mar 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2024 to 09 Mar 2025
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
AVP - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
DATE: 10 Mar 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 09 Mar 2025
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: AVP - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020