THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:30:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA MENG GE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GE is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. GE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA MENG GE shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GE is enrolled at Western University;
(2) Dr. GE shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GE is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. GE shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GE is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2020
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020