THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 22:27:29 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Main Floor – Doors off Main Parking Lot
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8219
Fax: (613) 738-8217
Address: 401 Smyth Road
CHEO
Gynecology Clinic C-9
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-2222
Fax: 613-738-4298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
Main Floor – Doors off Main Parking Lot
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8219
Fax: (613) 738-8217
Address: 401 Smyth Road
CHEO
Gynecology Clinic C-9
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Phone: 613-737-2222
Fax: 613-738-4298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER STEPHANIE MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER STEPHANIE MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020